This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/23/2022 at 02:00:57 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Lee Allen Gatzke

Case Summary

On 06/13/2021 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Lee Allen Gatzke. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Dehring, Robert F., Jr and Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0236

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Dehring, Robert F., Jr

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Defendant

Gatzke, Lee Allen

Lake Mills, WI 53551

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mcfadden, Bryant J

Other Attorneys

Teuber, Brookellen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $182.7; Additional Text: 21R 014619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Disposition ec/pc: DA, Atty McFadden, Def with ettp slip (7/29/21--ma)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Extension for time to pay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Extension for time to pay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $182.7; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Dept. of Natural Resources; Violation Date: 2021-03-02; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 29.506(2); Charge Description: Operate Tax. Business w/o License (1st); Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea - written

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on August 12, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 109706, Payable Number: 182828, Receipt Number: 21R 011387, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty. McFadden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $182.7; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $182.7; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 29.506(2); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-07-29; Description: Operate Tax. Business w/o License (1st); Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-07-29; Ordered Date: 2021-07-29; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Weber, Jennifer; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less