This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 01:19:39 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Joshua Wayne Hanson

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Joshua Wayne Hanson. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0143

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Hanson, Joshua Wayne

Bayfield, WI 54814

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of non-compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: 30 Day SDC Notice Sent. Return to Sender- Insufficient Address. No Updated Address Found, Cannot Resend.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 30 Day SDC Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Nonmilitary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BAYFIELD; Case number: 2021FO000143; Caption: State of Wisconsin vs. Joshua Wayne Hanson; Total Amount: $204.76; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Joshua Wayne Hanson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 87780 State Highway 13, Bayfield, WI 54814; Judgment Party; Party Name: Bayfield County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $200.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.71; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.71; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.71; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.71; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.71; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $200.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $201.21; Adjustments: $3.55; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $204.76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Default Judgment Sent. Return to Sender-Insufficient Address. No Updated Address Found, Cannot Resend.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $200.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; VIN: JHMCG5655XC038081; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Officer Name: Sauld, Craig; Violation Date: 2021-03-11; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 287.81(2)(a); Charge Description: Deposit or Discharge Solid Waste on Public or Private Property (<10 gallons); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 287.81(2)(a); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-04-19; Description: Deposit or Discharge Solid Waste on Public or Private Property (<10 gallons); Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-04-19; Ordered Date: 2021-04-19; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less