This case was last updated from Green Lake County Courts on 12/26/2022 at 17:17:09 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Donald Ross Sell

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Donald Ross Sell. This case was filed in Green Lake County Courts, Green Lake County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Slate, Mark T. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0112

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Green Lake, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Slate, Mark T

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sell, Donald Ross

Markesan, WI 53946

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Intake; Court Official: Slate, Mark T.; Location: Courtroom 1; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $343.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Dept. of Natural Resources; Violation Date: 2022-11-18; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: NR10.07(2)(a); Charge Description: Place, Use, Hunt Wild Animals with Bait (<5 Gallons); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: NR10.07(2)(a); Description: Place, Use, Hunt Wild Animals with Bait (<5 Gallons)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less