This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 07/12/2022 at 18:13:40 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. David B Smith

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against David B Smith. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Gruber, William V and Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0208

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Gruber, William V

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Defendant

Smith, David B

Milwaukee, WI 53206

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $222.9; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $222.9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $222.9; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Dept. of Natural Resources; Violation Date: 2022-05-08; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 29.024(1); Charge Description: Fish without License - R; Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 29.024(1); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-06-14; Description: Fish without License - R; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-06-14; Ordered Date: 2022-06-14; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Weber, Jennifer; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less