This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/22/2022 at 20:15:51 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Dale A Posthuma

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Dale A Posthuma. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Voigt, W. Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0314

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Voigt, W. Andrew

 

Party Details

Defendants

Posthuma, Dale A

Cambria, WI 53923

Posthuma, Dale Allen

Cambria, WI 53923

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Yaskal, Brenda L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Fine paid in full; Amount: $263.5; Additional Text: 21R 008041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Time to Pay Summary sent to defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $263.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $263.5; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew; Court Reporter: Seymour, Meredith; Additional Text: 1:50 PM Prosecuting attorney Brenda L. Yaskal appeared by video Zoom for the State of Wisconsin, Defendant Dale A Posthuma appeared by video Zoom, in custody from the Columbia County Jail. Defendant pleads no contest, Court finds defendant guilty, Orders $263.50 forfeiture, due in 60 days or payment plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 15.101(76); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-05-25; Description: Disorderly Conduct; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-05-25; Ordered Date: 2021-05-25; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Voigt, W. Andrew; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yaskal, Brenda L.