This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 01/30/2023 at 18:33:36 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Brandon Allen Butteris

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 State of Wisconsin filed an Other lawsuit against Brandon Allen Butteris. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0304

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Defendant

Butteris, Brandon Allen

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $258.1; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: ES3291; Issuing Agency: Dept. of Natural Resources; Violation Date: 2022-11-19; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 167.31(2)(b)1; Charge Description: Illegal loaded firearm (not handgun) in motorized vehicle; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Fine paid in full; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $258.1; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $258.1; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 167.31(2)(b)1; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2023-01-09; Description: Illegal loaded firearm (not handgun) in motorized vehicle; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2023-01-09; Ordered Date: 2023-01-09; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Allen, Matthew C.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less