This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 02/26/2022 at 00:56:40 (UTC).

Platteville, City of vs. Kendra Evelena Hamilton

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 Platteville, City of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Kendra Evelena Hamilton. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Day, Jennifer and VanDeHey, Robert P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1499

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Day, Jennifer

VanDeHey, Robert P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Hamilton, Kendra Evelena

Platteville, WI 53818

Not Yet Classified

Platteville City Atty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Review hearing; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Location: Grant County Courthouse - Br. I - 3rd Floor; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Review hearing on April 18, 2022 at 04:00 pm. You may join this hearing by video using the following website: https://wicourts.zoom.us/j/600348151 (meeting ID: 600-348-151). To appear by video, you will need a web camera and microphone. If you are unable to join by internet using video, you may join the hearing by phone by calling 1-312-626-6799 (meeting ID: 600-348-151). If you wish to appear in person, please contact Judge VanDeHey's Judicial Assistant at (608) 723-7826.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Review hearing; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.; Additional Text: Defendant appears in person with Juvenile. Defendant heard on home schooling; troubles with Platteville Schools; considering Cuba City Schools; mental health challenges of Juvenile. Court heard and truancy cases to be monitored with 21JV37 & 21JV41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Reopen; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Review hearing on January 18, 2022 at 04:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Review hearing; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.; Additional Text: Clerk's Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Review hearing on December 20, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Review hearing on December 21, 2021 at 03:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: yes; Issuing Agency: Platteville Police Dept; Officer Name: Grabandt, Josh; Violation Date: 2021-11-02; Plaintiff Agency: Platteville, City of; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 41.05(12); Charge Description: Parent Responsibility for School Attendance; Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.; Additional Text: Clerk's Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $263.5; Adjustments: $-263.5; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 41.05(12); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-12-20; Description: Parent Responsibility for School Attendance; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-12-20; Ordered Date: 2021-12-20; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less