This case was last updated from Price County Courts on 03/04/2023 at 18:04:55 (UTC).

Park Falls, City of vs. Rosa Marie Vialpando

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Park Falls, City of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Rosa Marie Vialpando. This case was filed in Price County Courts, Price County Circuit Court located in Price, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Klein, Kevin G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Price, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Klein, Kevin G

 

Party Details

Defendant

Vialpando, Rosa Marie

Not Yet Classified

Park Falls, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Schoenborn, Bryce Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $314.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Park Falls Police Dept.; Officer Name: Larson, Luke; Violation Date: 2022-09-30; Plaintiff Agency: Park Falls, City of; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 11-3-7; Charge Description: Retail Theft; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Klein, Kevin G; Court Reporter: Gutierrez, Alexis; Additional Text: 9:08 AM Defendant Rosa Marie Vialpando in court without counsel. Defendant enters NOT GUILTY plea. This matter will be set for further proceedings.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea; Court Official: Klein, Kevin G; Additional Text: Count 01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 11-3-7; Plea: Not Guilty on 2023-02-28; Description: Retail Theft

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less