This case was last updated from Outagamie County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:08:53 (UTC).

Outagamie County vs. Mallory Ann Witt

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Outagamie County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Mallory Ann Witt. This case was filed in Outagamie County Courts, Outagamie County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Figy, Brian. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1198

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Outagamie, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Figy, Brian

 

Party Details

Defendant

Witt, Mallory Ann

Freedom, WI 54913

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Intake; Court Official: Figy, Brian; Location: Commissioner Courtroom A, 920-832-5093; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $None; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: yes; Issuing Agency: Outagamie County Sheriff's Dep; Officer Name: Paulson, Clay J; Violation Date: 2022-11-23; Plaintiff Agency: Outagamie County; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: OU34-11; Charge Description: SS125.07 Underage alcohol possess or consume; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: OU34-11; Description: SS125.07 Underage alcohol possess or consume

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less