This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/02/2023 at 14:08:37 (UTC).

Oshkosh, City of vs. Witzlib 1380 Ceape Residential Trust

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 Oshkosh, City of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Witzlib 1380 Ceape Residential Trust. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Heywood, Eric R. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0123

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Heywood, Eric R

 

Party Details

Defendant

Witzlib 1380 Ceape Residential Trust

1380 Ceape Ave

Oshkosh, WI 54901

Not Yet Classified

City of Oshkosh Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Vanden Hogen, Amy Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Intake; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.; Location: 1st Floor, Room 150; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $696.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: City of Oshkosh Police; Violation Date: 2023-01-16; Plaintiff Agency: Oshkosh, City of; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 7-8; Charge Description: Failue to Obtain a Building Permit; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically for Witzlib 1380 Ceape Residential Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 7-8; Description: Failue to Obtain a Building Permit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less