This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 03/31/2023 at 18:33:30 (UTC).

Oshkosh, City of vs. SS Oshkosh LLC

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 Oshkosh, City of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against SS Oshkosh LLC. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Heywood, Eric R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0125

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Heywood, Eric R

 

Party Details

Defendant

SS Oshkosh LLC

Not Yet Classified

City of Oshkosh Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Vanden Hogen, Amy Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: DE's Judgment of Dismissal/Acquittal - attempted, not known, unable to forward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.; Additional Text: Defendant SS Oshkosh LLC not in court. City moves to dismiss.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Judgment of dismissal/acquittal; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: DE's Notice of Hearing for Intake on 03/08/23 - Returned as "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward".

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: DE's Judgment for unpaid fines, forfeitures and other financial obligations and Notice of Certification - no such number, unable to forward.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $232.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: City of Oshkosh Police; Violation Date: 2023-01-11; Plaintiff Agency: Oshkosh, City of; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 7-8; Charge Description: Failue to Obtain a Building Permit; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Intake on March 8, 2023 at 09:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically for SS Oshkosh LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 7-8; Action: Dismissed on Prosecutor's Motion; Description: Failue to Obtain a Building Permit; Sentences; Ordered Date: 2023-03-08; Action: Dismissed on Prosecutor's Motion; Court official: Heywood, Eric R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less