This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:03:37 (UTC).

Oshkosh, City of vs. Kevin L Parish

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Oshkosh, City of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Kevin L Parish. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Heywood, Eric R. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1915

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Heywood, Eric R

 

Party Details

Defendant

Parish, Kevin L

Oshkosh, WI 54901

Not Yet Classified

City of Oshkosh Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Intake; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.; Location: 1st Floor, Room 150; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $295.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: City of Oshkosh Police; Violation Date: 2022-12-01; Plaintiff Agency: Oshkosh, City of; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 943.50(1m)(b); Charge Description: County Retail Theft-Intentionally Take; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 943.50(1m)(b); Description: County Retail Theft-Intentionally Take

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less