This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 03/31/2023 at 18:34:59 (UTC).

Oshkosh, City of vs. Javier Dimas

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 Oshkosh, City of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Javier Dimas. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Winnebago, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Heywood, Eric R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0121

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Heywood, Eric R

 

Party Details

Defendant

Dimas, Javier

Not Yet Classified

City of Oshkosh Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Vanden Hogen, Amy Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2023
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $696.0; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $696.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $696.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: City of Oshkosh Police; Violation Date: 2023-01-19; Plaintiff Agency: Oshkosh, City of; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 230.28; Charge Description: Only power service-drop conductors can be attached to service masts; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically for Dimas, Javier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 230.28; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2023-02-08; Description: Only power service-drop conductors can be attached to service masts; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2023-02-08; Ordered Date: 2023-02-08; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Heywood, Eric R.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less