This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/02/2023 at 14:07:32 (UTC).

Oshkosh, City of vs. Gillens LLC

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 Oshkosh, City of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Gillens LLC. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Heywood, Eric R. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0127

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Heywood, Eric R

 

Party Details

Defendant

Gillens LLC

5042 Washington St

Butte Des Morts, WI 54927

Not Yet Classified

City of Oshkosh Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Vanden Hogen, Amy Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Intake; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.; Location: 1st Floor, Room 150; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $696.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: City of Oshkosh Police; Violation Date: 2023-01-16; Plaintiff Agency: Oshkosh, City of; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 17-36A; Charge Description: Failure to Maintain Exterior of Structure- windows; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically for Gillens LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 17-36A; Description: Failure to Maintain Exterior of Structure- windows

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less