This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:03:58 (UTC).

Oshkosh, City of vs. Drew Clark

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Oshkosh, City of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Drew Clark. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Heywood, Eric R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1909

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Heywood, Eric R

 

Party Details

Defendant

Clark, Drew

Oshkosh, WI 54901

Not Yet Classified

City of Oshkosh Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Vanden Hogen, Amy Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2023
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $232.0; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $232.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $232.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: City of Oshkosh Police; Violation Date: 2022-11-22; Plaintiff Agency: Oshkosh, City of; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 16-35A(1)(a); Charge Description: Failure to Maintain Ceiling; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Heywood, Eric R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically for Clark, Drew

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 16-35A(1)(a); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-12-14; Description: Failure to Maintain Ceiling; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-12-14; Ordered Date: 2022-12-14; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Heywood, Eric R.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vanden Hogen, Amy Marie