This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 20:32:27 (UTC).

Lake Delton, Village of vs. Austin Tracie Stevenson

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Lake Delton, Village of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Austin Tracie Stevenson. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are O'Rourke, Debra V, Barrett, Patricia A and City. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0581

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

O'Rourke, Debra V

Barrett, Patricia A

City

 

Party Details

Defendant

Stevenson, Austin Tracie

Beloit, WI 53511

Not Yet Classified

Lake Delton Village Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Cross, Richard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SAUK; Case number: 2021FO000581; Caption: Lake Delton, Village of vs. Austin Tracie Stevenson; Total Amount: $515.5; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Austin Tracie Stevenson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2140 E Ridge Rd, Beloit, WI 53511; Judgment Party; Party Name: Sauk County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $515.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $515.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $515.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $515.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Barrett, Patricia A.; Additional Text: and Motion for Default Judgment due to Defendant non-appearance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Barrett, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Barrett, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference data; Additional Text: failed to appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on August 5, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $515.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: 3193229; Expiration: 2003; VIN: 1GNDT13W8R2167374; Issuing Agency: Lake Delton Police Dept; Violation Date: 2021-05-23; Plaintiff Agency: Lake Delton, Village of; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 42.10(A-E); Charge Description: Disorderly Conduct with a M/V; Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea - written; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.; Additional Text: Count 01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Barrett, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 42.10(A-E); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: Not guilty - written on 2021-07-12; Description: Disorderly Conduct with a M/V; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-08-16; Ordered Date: 2021-08-16; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Barrett, Patricia A.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cross, Richard