This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 01/30/2023 at 18:33:05 (UTC).

Iowa County Planning & Develop vs. Luke White

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 Iowa County Planning Develop filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Luke White. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0308

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Defendant

White, Luke

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Leigh, Zachary P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Location: Iowa County Courthouse; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on April 13, 2023 at 09:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEvent: Status conference for White, Luke; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: Attorney Curtis Johnson in court for Iowa County Planning & Develop. Defendant Luke White in court. Ct. hears from Luke White and sets status for 4/13/2023 at 9:00 a.m. Status conference scheduled for April 13, 2023 at 09:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $357.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: County of Iowa; Violation Date: 2022-08-31; Plaintiff Agency: Iowa County Planning & Develop; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 5.0; Charge Description: Sanitation; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Additional Text: Count 01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on January 26, 2023 at 09:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Intake for White, Luke; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: Defendant Luke White in court. , NG plea entered, Ct. sets status for 1/26/2023 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 5.0; Plea: Not Guilty on 2022-12-12; Description: Sanitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less