This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 01/30/2023 at 18:32:41 (UTC).

Iowa County Planning & Develop vs. Coyne Family LTD Partnership

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 Iowa County Planning Develop filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Coyne Family LTD Partnership. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0310

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Defendant

Coyne Family LTD Partnership

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Leigh, Zachary P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $357.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: County of Iowa; Violation Date: 2022-08-31; Plaintiff Agency: County of Iowa; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 5.0; Charge Description: Sanitary; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Intake for Coyne Family LTD Partnership; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 5.0; Action: Dismissed on Prosecutor's Motion; Description: Sanitary; Sentences; Ordered Date: 2022-12-12; Action: Dismissed on Prosecutor's Motion; Court official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less