This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 05:51:10 (UTC).

Green, County of vs. Curtis Lashawn Curry Jr

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Green, County of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Curtis Lashawn Curry Jr. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Vale, Thomas J and Nolen, Craig R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0206

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Vale, Thomas J

Nolen, Craig R

 

Party Details

Defendant

Curry, Curtis Lashawn, Jr

Monroe, WI 53566

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Frutiger, Corinne L

Nolen, Craig

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Plea/sentencing hearing; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Court Reporter: Severson, Denise; Additional Text: Curtis Lashawn Curry, defendant appeared in Court in person with counsel C. James Fitzgerald. Craig Nolen appeared as prosecuting attorney. Matter dismissed and read in.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Plea/sentencing hearing on September 28, 2021 at 02:15 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Nolen, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Curry, Curtis Lashawn, Jr; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Curtis Lashawn Curry Jr Current: 2827 Sixth Street, c/o Green County Jail, Monroe, WI 53566 United States (Effective: 08-09-2021) Prior: RUMS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Curry, Curtis Lashawn, Jr; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Curtis Lashawn Curry Jr Current: RUMS, (Effective: 08-06-2021) Prior: 2060 Allen Blvd, Middleton, WI 53562

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $389.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: 824XFK; Expiration: 2022; VIN: KL7CJKSB5HB146671; Issuing Agency: Green County Sheriff; Violation Date: 2021-06-21; Plaintiff Agency: Green, County of; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: G7-4-19a; Charge Description: Poss 25 grams or less of marijuana; Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Additional Text: Count 01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on September 7, 2021 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: G7-4-19a; Action: Charge Dismissed but Read In; Plea: Not Guilty on 2021-07-19; Description: Poss 25 grams or less of marijuana; Sentences; Ordered Date: 2021-09-28; Action: Charge Dismissed but Read In; Court official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nolen, Craig