This case was last updated from Price County Courts on 02/06/2023 at 18:17:37 (UTC).

Fifield Sanitary District 1 vs. Jon D Werkmeister

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 Fifield Sanitary District 1 filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jon D Werkmeister. This case was filed in Price County Courts, Price County Circuit Court located in Price, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Klein, Kevin G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0396

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Price, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Klein, Kevin G

 

Party Details

Defendant

Werkmeister, Jon D

Not Yet Classified

Fifield Sanitary District 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Schoenborn, Bryce Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $263.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $263.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Klein, Kevin G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Fifield Sanitary District 1; Violation Date: 2022-07-01; Plaintiff Agency: Fifield Sanitary District 1; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 10A(5); Charge Description: Fail to submit annual SAFE water/well test; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Default Judgment for Werkmeister, Jon D; Court Official: Klein, Kevin G; Additional Text: 9:00 AM Defendant Jon D Werkmeister not in court. Attorney Bryce Alan Schoenborn in court for Fifield Sanitary District 1. Court deems defendant guilty. Court imposes fine of $263.50, 30 days to pay, right to purge.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Klein, Kevin G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed for Werkmeister, Jon D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 10A(5); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2023-01-10; Description: Fail to submit annual SAFE water/well test; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2023-01-10; Ordered Date: 2023-01-10; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Klein, Kevin G; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less