This case was last updated from Price County Courts on 01/05/2023 at 17:16:50 (UTC).

Fifield Sanitary District 1 vs. Jon D Werkmeister

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 Fifield Sanitary District 1 filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jon D Werkmeister. This case was filed in Price County Courts, Price County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Klein, Kevin G. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0396

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Price, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Klein, Kevin G

 

Party Details

Defendant

Werkmeister, Jon D

Fifield, WI 54524

Not Yet Classified

Fifield Sanitary District 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Schoenborn, Bryce Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Initial appearance; Court Official: Klein, Kevin G; Location: Price County Courthouse; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Fifield Sanitary District 1; Violation Date: 2022-07-01; Plaintiff Agency: Fifield Sanitary District 1; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 10A(5); Charge Description: Fail to submit annual SAFE water/well test; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed for Werkmeister, Jon D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 10A(5); Description: Fail to submit annual SAFE water/well test

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less