This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 01:43:30 (UTC).

Dodge, County of vs. Jamie Lee Busshardt

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Dodge, County of filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jamie Lee Busshardt. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Seim, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0296

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Seim, Steven

 

Party Details

Defendant

Busshardt, Jamie Lee

Watertown, WI 53094

Not Yet Classified

Corporation Counsel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $38.5; Additional Text: 21R 022219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $50.0; Additional Text: 21R 020703

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $25.0; Additional Text: 21R 018741

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $50.0; Additional Text: 21R 016944

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $50.0; Additional Text: 21R 015093

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: CRAKER; Expiration: 2021; VIN: ZASFAKNN1J7C01770; Issuing Agency: Dodge County Sheriff; Officer Name: Anderson, Dep Scott; Violation Date: 2021-06-04; Plaintiff Agency: Dodge, County of; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 961.573(1); Charge Description: Possess Drug Paraphernalia (Forfeiture); Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $50.0; Additional Text: 21R 013058

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Seim, Steven; Court Reporter: Recording System

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $263.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $263.5; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 961.573(1); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-07-22; Description: Possess Drug Paraphernalia (Forfeiture); Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-07-22; Ordered Date: 2021-07-22; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Seim, Steven; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less