This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 04:41:22 (UTC).

County of Rock vs. Jade N. Barker-Martinez

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 County of Rock filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jade N Barker-Martinez. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Meyer, Stephen D and Hoag, Jack. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1984

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Meyer, Stephen D

Hoag, Jack

 

Party Details

Defendant

Barker-Martinez, Jade N.

Beloit, WI 53511

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lee, Emmeline

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: ROCK; Case number: 2021FO001984; Caption: County of Rock vs. Jade N. Barker-Martinez; Total Amount: $363.5; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jade N. Barker-Martinez; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1224 Summit Ave, Beloit, WI 53511; Judgment Party; Party Name: Rock County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $363.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $363.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $363.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $363.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Plea/sentencing hearing; Court Official: Hoag, Jack; Court Reporter: Nelson, Debra A.; Additional Text: 3:04 PM Defendant Jade N. Barker-Martinez in court by video, in custody. Emmeline Lee appeared by video and Mary Bricco appeared by video for the County of Rock. Defendant address verified. Penalties advised. Defendant pleads guilty to count 1. Court finds the defendant guilty on count 1. Count 2 is dismissed on motion of the County. Court orders a fine of $100 and costs due within 60 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Hoag, Jack; Court Reporter: Nelson, Debra A.; Additional Text: Activity: Plea/sentencing Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official, Court Reporter, Court Clerk, and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 2; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 3.201DV; Action: Dismissed on Prosecutor's Motion; Description: Rock County Ordinance - Disorderly Conduct-DV; Sentences; Ordered Date: 2021-11-24; Action: Dismissed on Prosecutor's Motion; Court official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 3.206(1)DV; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Plea: Guilty on 2021-11-24; Description: Rock County Ordinance - Battery as a Domestic Abuse Incident; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-11-24; Ordered Date: 2021-11-24; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Court official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine; Notes: Clerk of Courts collect.

    Read MoreRead Less