This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 02/25/2022 at 15:03:55 (UTC).

County of Monroe vs. Sophi L. Robertson

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 County of Monroe filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Sophi L Robertson. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Ziegler, Todd L and Chapiewsky, Shirley K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0395

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Ziegler, Todd L

Chapiewsky, Shirley K

 

Party Details

Defendants

Robertson, Sophi L.

Whites Creek, TN 37189

Robertson, Sophi Lauryn

Whites Creek, TN 37189

Hayes, Sphi Lauryn

Whites Creek, TN 37189

Shinn, Sophi

Whites Creek, TN 37189

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Tempelis, Eric Christopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Additional Text: Judge, Reporter, Clerk, and Attorney Skiles appeared by video through Zoom.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L; Court Reporter: Griffin, Kathy J; Additional Text: Defendant does not appear, No Attorney present, Defaulted, Court finds Defendant guilty to Count 1, Count 2 is dismissed, $295.00 due by 01-03-2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: Reminder Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Intake on November 2, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $295.0; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $295.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 2; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 20-16; Action: Dismissed on Prosecutor's Motion; Description: Disorderly Conduct; Sentences; Ordered Date: 2021-11-02; Action: Dismissed on Prosecutor's Motion; Court official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 20-14; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-11-02; Description: Battery; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-11-02; Ordered Date: 2021-11-02; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Ziegler, Todd L; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less