This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 02/23/2022 at 23:46:52 (UTC).

County of Monroe vs. Robert Jajuan Lewis

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 County of Monroe filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Robert Jajuan Lewis. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Ziegler, Todd L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0307

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Ziegler, Todd L

 

Party Details

Defendants

Lewis, Robert Jajuan

Saint Charles, MN 55972

Lewis, Robert J.

Saint Charles, MN 55972

Lewis, Robert

Saint Charles, MN 55972

Lewis, Robert Jujuan

Saint Charles, MN 55972

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Betthauser, Charles David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Lewis, Robert Jajuan; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Robert Jajuan Lewis Current: PO Box 612, Saint Charles, MN 55972 United States (Effective: 09-27-2021) Prior: 685 West 5th Street #1, Winona, MN 55987

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Reminder Notice dated 9-16-21 was returned from the post office: Return to Sender, Robert Lewis, PO Box 612, Saint Charles MN 55972. Forwarded.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: Reminder Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Additional Text: Judge, Reporter, Clerk, Lisa with DA's office, Rhonda and Grant with State Patrol, and Warden Modjeski appeared by video through Zoom. Terry with MCSD appeared by phone through Zoom.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L; Court Reporter: Griffin, Kathy J; Additional Text: Defendant does not appear, No Attorney present, Defaulted, Court finds Defendant guilty, $295.00 due by 11-16-2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $295.0; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $295.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 20-6(b)(1); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-09-14; Description: Theft; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-09-14; Ordered Date: 2021-09-14; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Ziegler, Todd L; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Betthauser, Charles David