This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 02/22/2022 at 19:38:59 (UTC).

County of Monroe vs. Leontay M. Troy

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 County of Monroe filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Leontay M Troy. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Radcliffe, Richard and Chapiewsky, Shirley K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0175

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Radcliffe, Richard

Chapiewsky, Shirley K

 

Party Details

Defendants

Troy, Leontay M.

Champaign, IL 61820

Troy, Leontan M.

Champaign, IL 61820

Leontan, Troy M.

Champaign, IL 61820

Troy, Leontan Marshawn

Champaign, IL 61820

Troy, Leontan Mashwan

Champaign, IL 61820

Troy, Leontan

Champaign, IL 61820

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

La Fleur, Julie L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $200.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $200.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Reminder Notice dated 6-8-21 was returned for better address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $100.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: yes; Plate Number: FGC240; Expiration: 2021; VIN: 1C3CDFBB7ED926273; Issuing Agency: State Patrol; Officer Name: Hausman, Nathaniel; Violation Date: 2021-04-18; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 961.41(3g)(e); Charge Description: Possession of THC; Severity: Misd. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Additional Text: Judge, Reporter, Clerk, and Attorney Croninger appeared by video through Zoom. The Defendant appeared by phone through Zoom.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Radcliffe, Richard; Court Reporter: Antonneau, Teri; Additional Text: Defendant appears by phone through Zoom, No Attorney present, Court gives offer, Defendant accepts offer, Court finds Defendant guilty, $50.00 fine plus cost due by 08-10-2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Radcliffe, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: Reminder Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Court Official: Radcliffe, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 20-15; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-06-08; Description: Possession of Marijuana; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-06-08; Ordered Date: 2021-06-08; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Radcliffe, Richard; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less