This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 01/30/2023 at 18:31:48 (UTC).

County of Iowa vs. Scott Philipps

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 County of Iowa filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Scott Philipps. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0322

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Defendant

Philipps, Scott

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Leigh, Zachary P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/11/2023

FinancialCourt Assessments: $357.0; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $357.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketBond mount: $357.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: County of Iowa; Violation Date: 2022-08-31; Plaintiff Agency: County of Iowa; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 5.0; Charge Description: Sanitary; Severity: Forf. U

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketEvent: Intake for Philipps, Scott; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: 09:25 am No appearance. DJE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022

DocketEvent: Citation filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 5.0; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-12-12; Description: Sanitary; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-12-12; Ordered Date: 2022-12-12; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Allen, Matthew C.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less