This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 01/30/2023 at 18:31:53 (UTC).

County of Iowa vs. Kathleen Thompson

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 County of Iowa filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Kathleen Thompson. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0321

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Defendant

Thompson, Kathleen

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Leigh, Zachary P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $357.0; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $357.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $357.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: County of Iowa; Violation Date: 2022-08-31; Plaintiff Agency: County of Iowa; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 5.0; Charge Description: Sanitary; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Intake for Thompson, Kathleen; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: 09:25 am No appearance. DJE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 5.0; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-12-12; Description: Sanitary; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-12-12; Ordered Date: 2022-12-12; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Allen, Matthew C.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less