This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 10:50:46 (UTC).

County of Chippewa vs. Rocky John Andrews

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 County of Chippewa filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Rocky John Andrews. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, James M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0538

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, James M

 

Party Details

Defendant

Andrews, Rocky John

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Bub, Christopher R.

Other Attorneys

Newell, Wade

Broeren, Lawrence Jean

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Isaacson, James M; Location: Chippewa County Courthouse, Branch 2; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on March 8, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, James M; Court Reporter: Fauske, Rheanna; Additional Text: Lawrence Jean Broeren appeared for the State of Wisconsin. ADA Broeren calls cases and addresses the court regarding withdrawl of counsel and requests to set for trial. Court grants and to be scheduled with JA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion; Additional Text: to Withdraw as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: to Withdraw as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Isaacson, James M; Additional Text: Withdrawing Attorney Bub as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $162.7; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: 1338YD; Expiration: 2023; Issuing Agency: Chippewa County Sheriff; Violation Date: 2021-06-25; Plaintiff Agency: County of Chippewa; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 30.523(2); Charge Description: Fail/Display Certification/Registration Decal on Boat; Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 107096, Payable Number: 155810, Receipt Number: 21R 011215, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Christopher Bub

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea - written

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Demand for Discovery - Defendant; Additional Text: and Inspection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: Filed by Attorney Bub

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $36.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 107097, Payable Number: 155810, Receipt Number: 21R 011215, Amount: $36.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea; Court Official: Isaacson, James M; Additional Text: Count 01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 30.523(2); Plea: Not Guilty on 2021-07-21; Description: Fail/Display Certification/Registration Decal on Boat

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Newell, Wade