This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:10:22 (UTC).

County of Chippewa vs. Jonathan Joseph Patterson

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 County of Chippewa filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jonathan Joseph Patterson. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, James M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0889

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, James M

 

Party Details

Defendant

Patterson, Jonathan Joseph

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Initial appearance; Court Official: Isaacson, James M; Location: Chippewa County Courthouse, Branch 2; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $200.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Chippewa County Sheriff; Officer Name: Eckwright, Christopher; Violation Date: 2022-11-27; Plaintiff Agency: County of Chippewa; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 174.042(1)(a); Charge Description: Dog Running at Large; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 174.042(1)(a); Description: Dog Running at Large

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less