This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 09/27/2022 at 18:10:46 (UTC).

County of Bayfield vs. Tamera Lee Miller

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 County of Bayfield filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Tamera Lee Miller. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0255

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Miller, Tamera Lee

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lawton, Kimberly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Location: Bayfield County Courthouse; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on January 9, 2023 at 02:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on September 26, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $181.6; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Violation Date: 2022-06-29; Plaintiff Agency: County of Bayfield; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 174.042(1)(a); Charge Description: Dog Running at Large; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea - written; Additional Text: Not guilty plea - written (NGPW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 174.042(1)(a); Description: Dog Running at Large

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less