This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 09/16/2022 at 18:18:54 (UTC).

County of Bayfield vs. Nolan Richard Wagner

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 County of Bayfield filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Nolan Richard Wagner. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Anderson, John P and Stella, Anthony J., Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0243

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Anderson, John P

Stella, Anthony J., Jr

 

Party Details

Defendant

Wagner, Nolan Richard

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wickman, Tyler William

Other Attorneys

Lawton, Kimberly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Initial appearance; Court Official: Stella, Anthony J., Jr.; Location: Bayfield County Courthouse, Room 105; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Initial appearance on September 19, 2022 at 03:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order assigning judge/judicial assignment order; Court Official: Stella, Anthony J., Jr.; Additional Text: Application and Order for Specific Judicial Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for specific judicial assign approved; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: ANS4772; Expiration: 2023; VIN: 1G1BE5SM2G7262264; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Officer Name: Kern, Tristan; Violation Date: 2022-06-20; Plaintiff Agency: County of Bayfield; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 961.41(3g)(e); Charge Description: Possession of THC (Ordinance Violation); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Additional Text: Notice of Retainer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea - written; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Additional Text: Written Not Guilty Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Additional Text: Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Request for substitution; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Additional Text: Request for Substitution of Judge Judge Anderson approved the request on July 28.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Initial appearance on August 8, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 961.41(3g)(e); Description: Possession of THC (Ordinance Violation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less