This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 15:46:14 (UTC).

County of Bayfield vs. Joshua L Charette

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 County of Bayfield filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Joshua L Charette. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0087

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Charette, Joshua L

Lac Du Flambeau, WI 54538

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lawton, Kimberly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of non-compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BAYFIELD; Case number: 2021FO000087; Caption: County of Bayfield vs. Joshua L Charette; Total Amount: $270.01; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Joshua L Charette; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 119 Clinic Rd Apt 1, Lac du Flambeau, WI 54538; Judgment Party; Party Name: Bayfield County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $263.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $263.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 30 Day SDC Notice Sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $264.43; Adjustments: $5.58; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $270.01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Officer Name: Kastern, Mike; Violation Date: 2021-01-31; Plaintiff Agency: County of Bayfield; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 11-1-1.2; Charge Description: County Ordinance of Possess THC; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Initial appearance on March 1, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 11-1-1.2; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Plea: Guilty on 2021-03-01; Description: County Ordinance of Possess THC; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-03-01; Ordered Date: 2021-03-01; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawton, Kimberly