This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 20:14:56 (UTC).

County of Bayfield vs. Jessica C Mossuto

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 County of Bayfield filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jessica C Mossuto. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0098

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Mossuto, Jessica C

Grand View, WI 54839

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lawton, Kimberly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of non-compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BAYFIELD; Case number: 2021FO000098; Caption: County of Bayfield vs. Jessica C Mossuto; Total Amount: $333.28; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jessica C Mossuto; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 54645 Blake Ave, Grand View, WI 54839; Judgment Party; Party Name: Bayfield County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $326.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.16; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.16; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.16; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.16; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.07; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $326.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 30 Day SDC Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Nonmilitary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $327.66; Adjustments: $2.84; Paid to the court: $23.25; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $307.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $326.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Violation Date: 2021-01-17; Plaintiff Agency: County of Bayfield; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 7-1-1(c); Charge Description: Bayfield County Ordinance Violation of Dog Owner Fail/Pay License Tax; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 7-1-1(c); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-03-02; Description: Bayfield County Ordinance Violation of Dog Owner Fail/Pay License Tax; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-03-02; Ordered Date: 2021-03-02; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawton, Kimberly