This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 12:15:58 (UTC).

County of Bayfield vs. Jessica C Mossuto

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 County of Bayfield filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jessica C Mossuto. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0042

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Mossuto, Jessica C

Grand View, WI 54839

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of non-compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 30 Day SDC Notice Sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BAYFIELD; Case number: 2021FO000042; Caption: County of Bayfield vs. Jessica C Mossuto; Total Amount: $268.15; Satisfaction: Full; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jessica C Mossuto; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 54645 Blake Ave, Grand View, WI 54839; Judgment Party; Party Name: Bayfield County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $263.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-12-08; Type: Full satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $263.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Violation Date: 2021-01-17; Plaintiff Agency: County of Bayfield; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 95.21(2)(a); Charge Description: Fail/Have Dog Vaccinated against Rabies; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $264.43; Adjustments: $2.7; Paid to the court: $267.13; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 95.21(2)(a); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-02-22; Description: Fail/Have Dog Vaccinated against Rabies; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-02-22; Ordered Date: 2021-02-22; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less