This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 09/17/2022 at 18:24:26 (UTC).

County of Bayfield vs. Jacky Patrick McClintock

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 County of Bayfield filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jacky Patrick McClintock. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Bayfield, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0246

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

McClintock, Jacky Patrick

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lawton, Kimberly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Fine paid in full; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: ANS4772; Expiration: 2023; VIN: 1G1BE5SM2G7262264; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Violation Date: 2022-06-20; Plaintiff Agency: County of Bayfield; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 961.573(1); Charge Description: Possess Drug Paraphernalia (Forfeiture); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $263.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $263.5; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Initial appearance on August 8, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 961.573(1); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-08-08; Description: Possess Drug Paraphernalia (Forfeiture); Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-08-08; Ordered Date: 2022-08-08; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less