This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 07:24:39 (UTC).

County of Bayfield vs. David Joe Arnold

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 County of Bayfield filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against David Joe Arnold. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Arnold, David Joe

Ironwood, MI 49938

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 30 Day SDC Notice Sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Arnold, David Joe; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for David Joe Arnold Current: 518 E Cloverland Dr, Ironwood, MI 49938 United States (Effective: 07-26-2021) Prior: 129 W. Coolidge Ave, Ironwood, MI 49938 United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialBalance due to court: $280.75

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Payment Plan Due Date Summary Sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Payment application agreement; Additional Text: Payment Application Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Additional Text: Defendant by video

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: yes; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Officer Name: Stoychoff, Will; Violation Date: 2021-01-03; Plaintiff Agency: County of Bayfield; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 961.41(3g)(e); Charge Description: Possession of THC (Forfeiture); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned initial appearance on May 10, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Arnold, David Joe; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for David Joe Arnold Current: 129 W. Coolidge Ave, Ironwood, MI 49938 United States (Effective: 03-29-2021) Prior: 105 Acorn St, Bremerton, WA 98310 United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Additional Text: Defendant by video

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Initial appearance on March 29, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 961.41(3g)(e); Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Plea: Guilty on 2021-05-10; Description: Possession of THC (Forfeiture); Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-05-10; Ordered Date: 2021-05-10; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less