This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:14:12 (UTC).

County of Bayfield vs. Corrin Renee Kangas

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 County of Bayfield filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Corrin Renee Kangas. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0381

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Kangas, Corrin Renee

Ashland, WI 54806

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $263.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $263.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Officer Name: Leino, Matt; Violation Date: 2022-11-09; Plaintiff Agency: County of Bayfield; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 947.01(1); Charge Description: Disorderly Conduct - County/Municipality; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 947.01(1); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-12-19; Description: Disorderly Conduct - County/Municipality; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-12-19; Ordered Date: 2022-12-19; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less