This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 15:43:41 (UTC).

County of Bayfield vs. Alexis Marie Cady

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 County of Bayfield filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Alexis Marie Cady. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Anderson, John P and Cederberg, Kay L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0147

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Anderson, John P

Cederberg, Kay L

 

Party Details

Defendant

Cady, Alexis Marie

Washburn, WI 54891

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Fine paid in full; Amount: $263.5; Additional Text: 21R 001447

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Renumber from; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Additional Text: 2021TR000215

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment of conviction; Court Official: Cederberg, Kay L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter from Northland Counseling Services stating completed AODA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: yes; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Officer Name: Dave, Renz; Violation Date: 2021-01-31; Plaintiff Agency: County of Bayfield; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 125.07(4)(b); Charge Description: Underage Drinking-Possess-17-20 (1st); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Initial appearance on March 22, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $263.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $263.5; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter from DE asking to re-schedule

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 125.07(4)(b); Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Plea: Guilty on 2021-03-22; Description: Underage Drinking-Possess-17-20 (1st); Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-03-22; Ordered Date: 2021-03-22; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: DOT License Suspended; Time: 90 Days; Notes: 90 days suspension is stayed for successful completion of the Underage Alcohol Awareness Program to be completed within 6 months time. If this program is not successfully completed, the 90 days suspension will be imposed by the Court.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine; Notes: Forfeiture in the amount of $263.50 to be paid within 60 days or set up a payment plan with the Clerk of Circuit Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less