This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/25/2022 at 22:00:53 (UTC).

Columbia County vs. Tom M Nguyen

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Columbia County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Tom M Nguyen. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Von Hoff, Andrea E, Staff and Voigt, W. Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0995

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Von Hoff, Andrea E

Staff

Voigt, W. Andrew

 

Party Details

Defendants

Nguyen, Tom M

Portage, WI 53901

Nguyen, Tom Minh

Portage, WI 53901

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Avena, Glenn Edward

Other Attorneys

Yaskal, Brenda L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew; Additional Text: Adopting stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew; Additional Text: Per stip, plead no contest to charge, fine $200.50 due 60 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Cash bond refunded; Amount: $1150.0; Additional Text: CK 24962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on January 11, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009133, Payable Number: 163866, Receipt Number: 21R 015385, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: filed by Atty Glenn Avena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea - written; Additional Text: filed by Atty Glenn Avena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Demand for Discovery - Defendant; Additional Text: filed by Atty Glenn Avena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: filed by Atty Glenn Avena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $36.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009135, Payable Number: 163866, Receipt Number: 21R 015385, Amount: $36.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $200.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $200.5; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Cash bond posted; Amount: $1150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 15.101(76); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-01-25; Description: Disorderly Conduct; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-01-25; Ordered Date: 2022-01-25; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Voigt, W. Andrew; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less