This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 10/10/2022 at 18:28:49 (UTC).

Columbia County vs. Michael D Long Sr

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 Columbia County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Michael D Long Sr. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in St. Croix, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hepler, Todd J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0612

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hepler, Todd J

 

Party Details

Defendants

Long Sr, Michael D

Poynette, WI 53955

Long, Michael Dwayne

Poynette, WI 53955

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Yaskal, Brenda L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $484.0; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $484.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default Judgment; Additional Text: Fine of $484 due in 60 days or payment plan arranged.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 3; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 15.101(110); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-08-31; Description: Possession of Marijuana; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-08-31; Ordered Date: 2022-08-31; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Hepler, Todd J.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less