This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/25/2022 at 15:31:33 (UTC).

Columbia County vs. Jaelyn A Brown

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 Columbia County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jaelyn A Brown. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Cross, Troy D, Von Hoff, Andrea E, Staff and Hepler, Todd J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0951

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Cross, Troy D

Von Hoff, Andrea E

Staff

Hepler, Todd J

 

Party Details

Defendant

Brown, Jaelyn A

College Park, GA 30349

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Calkins, Kevin R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Court trial; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.; Location: Columbia County Courthouse; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on April 13, 2022 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Staff Attorney; Additional Text: Per DA, pretrial conference held. matter to be set for trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on December 28, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea - written; Additional Text: Filed by defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Brown, Jaelyn A; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Jaelyn A Brown Current: 4110 Glad Morning Dr, College Park, GA 30349 United States (Effective: 10-25-2021) Prior: 6302 Rustic Ridge, Grand Blanc, MI 48439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Mailing in written not guilty plea.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: filed by District Attorney office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Court Official: Cross, Troy D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketEvent: Cash bond posted; Amount: $100.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • ChargeCount No: 5; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 22-1-1(dc); Description: Possession of Marijuana

    Read MoreRead Less