This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 09:09:21 (UTC).

City of Washburn vs. Summer Elizabeth Carol Nabozny

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 City of Washburn filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Summer Elizabeth Carol Nabozny. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Nabozny, Summer Elizabeth Carol

Ashland, WI 54806

Not Yet Classified

Washburn Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of non-compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 30 Day SDC Notice Sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BAYFIELD; Case number: 2021FO000032; Caption: City of Washburn vs. Summer Elizabeth Carol Nabozny; Total Amount: $179.64; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Summer Elizabeth Carol Nabozny; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 810 Saint Claire St, Ashland, WI 54806; Judgment Party; Party Name: Bayfield County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $175.3; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.62; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.62; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.62; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.62; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.62; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.62; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $175.3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $175.92; Adjustments: $3.72; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $179.64

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $175.3; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: AJZ1080; Expiration: 2021; VIN: 3FAFP07266R231672; Issuing Agency: Washburn Police Dept; Officer Name: Johnson, Ken; Violation Date: 2021-01-11; Plaintiff Agency: City of Washburn; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 10-5-1; Charge Description: City of Washburn Ordinance - Abandoned Vehicles; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 10-5-1; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-02-15; Description: City of Washburn Ordinance - Abandoned Vehicles; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-02-15; Ordered Date: 2021-02-15; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less