This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 15:50:10 (UTC).

City of Washburn vs. Dale Joesph Helwig

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 City of Washburn filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Dale Joesph Helwig. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0059

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Helwig, Dale Joesph

Washburn, WI 54891

Not Yet Classified

Washburn Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Under Age Program Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter from Northland Counseling Services.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Signed Bay. Co. Underage Alcohol Violation Program, cc to Northland Counseling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Addressed to DE from COC with assessment form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: MNS536; Expiration: 2021; VIN: 4T1G11AK6MU409275; Issuing Agency: Washburn Police Dept; Officer Name: Suminski, Nicholas; Violation Date: 2021-02-03; Plaintiff Agency: City of Washburn; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 125.07(4)(b); Charge Description: Underage Drinking-Possess-17-20 (1st); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: No Contest Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $263.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $263.5; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 125.07(4)(b); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-03-15; Description: Underage Drinking-Possess-17-20 (1st); Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-03-15; Ordered Date: 2021-03-15; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less