This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 02/25/2022 at 10:09:46 (UTC).

City of Eau Claire vs. Alicia Garcia

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 City of Eau Claire filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Alicia Garcia. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Smetana, Daniel M, Novak, Nathan E and Raihle, Rita A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1553

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Smetana, Daniel M

Novak, Nathan E

Raihle, Rita A

 

Party Details

Defendant

Garcia, Alicia

Madison, WI 53719

Not Yet Classified

City Attorney's Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hoffer, Douglas James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Intake; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.; Location: Commissioner's Courtroom - Room 2601; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.; Additional Text: Order on Motion to Reopen Traffic Forfeiture

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Raihle, Rita A; Additional Text: On Motion to Reopen Traffic Forfeiture -granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Reopen; Court Official: Raihle, Rita A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea - written

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pretrial Conference: February 10, 2022 at 9:45 am., City Attorneys office to call. Intake on February 16, 2022 at 02:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion to reopen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Garcia, Alicia; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Alicia Garcia Current: 7701 Crowling Stone Road, Madison, WI 53719 United States (Effective: 12-20-2021) Prior: 716 3rd Ave, Eau Claire, WI 54703

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $389.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: City of Eau Claire; Officer Name: Stoik, Renee N.; Violation Date: 2021-09-11; Plaintiff Agency: City of Eau Claire; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 9.56.075; Charge Description: Loud Party; Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Smetana, Daniel M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Smetana, Daniel M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $389.5; Adjustments: $-389.5; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 9.56.075(a); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-10-27; Description: Loud Party or Gathering; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-10-27; Ordered Date: 2021-10-27; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Smetana, Daniel M.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hoffer, Douglas James