This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 01/30/2023 at 18:32:27 (UTC).

City of Dodgeville vs. Sarah A. Hancock

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 City of Dodgeville filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Sarah A Hancock. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0313

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Defendant

Hancock, Sarah A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $200.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $200.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Intake for Hancock, Sarah A.; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $120.51; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $120.51; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed for Hancock, Sarah A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 943.24(1); Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Plea: Guilty on 2022-12-19; Description: County/Municipality Worthless Checks; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-12-19; Ordered Date: 2022-12-19; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Court official: Allen, Matthew C.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine; Sentence Details; Sentence: Restitution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less