This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:14:19 (UTC).

City of Dodgeville vs. Brian Keith Schultz

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 City of Dodgeville filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Brian Keith Schultz. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0326

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Defendant

Schultz, Brian Keith

Not Yet Classified

City of Dodgeville

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Intake; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Location: Iowa County Courthouse; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $200.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: City of Dodgeville; Violation Date: 2022-12-01; Plaintiff Agency: City of Dodgeville; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 9.943.50; Charge Description: Shoplifting (Property Value $0.00-$5.00); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 9.943.50; Description: Shoplifting (Property Value $0.00-$5.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less