This case was last updated from Ashland County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 14:35:16 (UTC).

City of Ashland vs. Tammy Jo Erickson

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 City of Ashland filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Tammy Jo Erickson. This case was filed in Ashland County Courts, Ashland County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Kelly J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0171

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Ashland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Kelly J

 

Party Details

Defendant

Erickson, Tammy Jo

Washburn, WI 54891

Not Yet Classified

Ashland City Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Notice of Intent to Certify Debt to the Wisconsin Department of Revenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: ASHLAND; Case number: 2021FO000171; Caption: City of Ashland vs. Tammy Jo Erickson; Total Amount: $246.08; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Tammy Jo Erickson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 800 8th Ave W, Cabin 6, Washburn, WI 54891; Judgment Party; Party Name: Ashland County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $243.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.86; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.86; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.86

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $243.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Intent to Certify Debt to the Wisconsin Department of Revenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $264.36; Adjustments: $1.72; Paid to the court: $20.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $246.08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: DeFault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Erickson, Tammy Jo; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Tammy Jo Erickson Current: 800 8th Ave W, Cabin 6, Washburn, WI 54891 United States (Effective: 05-06-2021) Prior: Homeless, Ashland, WI 54806

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: City of Ashland Police Dept.; Officer Name: Westlund, Mitchell; Violation Date: 2021-04-03; Plaintiff Agency: City of Ashland; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 201.08; Charge Description: Adult-Shoplifting; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Court Reporter: Brown, Julie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 201.08; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-07-06; Description: Adult-Shoplifting; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-07-06; Ordered Date: 2021-07-06; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: McKnight, Kelly J; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less