This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 18:08:44 (UTC).

Barron County vs. Michael E Campbell

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Barron County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Michael E Campbell. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Babler, James C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0210

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Babler, James C

 

Party Details

Defendant

Campbell, Michael E

Rice Lake, WI 54868

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wright, Brian H., Aty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $300.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $300.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Returned Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Non appearance; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Court Reporter: Fornell, Laura; Additional Text: Prosecuting attorney Brady James Seidlitz in court for the State of Wisconsin. Defendant Michael E Campbell not in court. Court enters default judgment in the amount of $300.50 forfeiture with 60 days to pay or payment plan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 9.01; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-06-09; Description: Disorderly Conduct; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-06-09; Ordered Date: 2022-06-09; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Babler, James C.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine; Notes: Financial obligations are due within 60 days of the sentence date. The Barron County Clerk of Courts shall collect all financial obligations. In the event of non-payment of outstanding financial obligations, a civil judgment shall be entered against the defendant and in favor of restitution victims and governmental entities for the balance due. All available enforcement actions will be used to collect all debt.; Charge Modifiers; Statute: 968.075(1)(a); Description: Domestic Abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wright, Brian H., Aty