This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 09/06/2022 at 10:47:31 (UTC).

Barron County vs. Kiana-Mae E Reynolds

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Barron County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Kiana-Mae E Reynolds. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Boyle, Maureen D and Millermon, Sharon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0353

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Boyle, Maureen D

Millermon, Sharon

 

Party Details

Defendants

Reynolds, Kiana-Mae E

Cumberland, WI 54829

Bearheart, Kiana-Mae E

Cumberland, WI 54829

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wright, Brian H., Aty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Cash bond posted; Amount: $150.0; Additional Text: 22R 005484

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $300.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $300.5; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Actual bond posted with sheriff; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D; Court Reporter: Sanford, Laura; Additional Text: 1:00 PM Defendant Kiana-Mae E Reynolds in court. Prosecuting attorney Brady James Seidlitz in court for the State of Wisconsin. Address confirmed and phone number provided/updated. Guilty plea entered. Court finds guilty and orders $300.50 with 60 DTP. $150.00 cash bond posted to be applied and $150.50 due in 60 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Cash bond posted; Amount: $150.5; Additional Text: 22R 005307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Cash bond applied; Amount: $150.5; Additional Text: 22A 051460

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judgment of conviction; Court Official: Millermon, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 9.01; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Plea: Guilty on 2022-08-09; Description: Disorderly Conduct; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-08-09; Ordered Date: 2022-08-09; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Court official: Boyle, Maureen D; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine; Notes: $150.00 cash bond applied. $150.50 balance due within 60 days. Financial obligations are due within 60 days of the sentence date. The Barron County Clerk of Courts shall collect all financial obligations. In the event of non-payment of outstanding financial obligations, a civil judgment shall be entered against the defendant and in favor of restitution victims and governmental entities for the balance due. All available enforcement actions will be used to collect all debt.; Charge Modifiers; Statute: 968.075(1)(a); Description: Domestic Abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wright, Brian H., Aty